top

Math Tricks: Multiply by 11

Multiplying by 11 is one of the easiest tricks to learn because you don't have to do any multiplication. You just have to know how to add.

This trick will work for any number multiplied by 11 even really large numbers.

Look at the math problem 11 X 3247 = ? Let's see how the trick works.

  • Write down the one's digit: 7
  • Add the one's and ten's digits together 7 + 4 = 11 so carry a 1 and write down 1.
  • Add the next two numbers 4 + 2 = 6 and add the 1 we carried which is 7. Write down 7.
  • Add the next two numbers 2 + 3 = 5 and no numbers carried over. Write down 5.
  • Add the last number 3 to any numbers you just carried over. We carried over 0 so write down 3

ANSWER is 35717.

Watch the math video below for a detailed explanation!



Practice Math Problems

  1. What does 11 x 845 equal?
  2. What does 11 x 21 equal?
  3. What does 11 x 62 equal?
  4. What does 11 x 144 equal?
  5. What does 11 x 623 equal?
  6. What does 11 x 84001 equal?
  7. What does 11 x 9533 equal?
  8. What does 11 x 11equal?
  9. What does 11 x 19 equal?
  10. What does 11 x 10002 equal?

bottom