# Multiply by 101

One of the easiest tricks that you will learn is multiplying by 101.

If you are multiplying 101 by a two digit number, finding the answer is as simple as writing down that number down twice. For example:

- 73 x 101 = 7373
- 83 x 101 = 8383

If instead you are multiplying by a three digit number, you first want to add the first digit to the entire number

For example: 101 x 345 = ?

- 3 + 345 = 348

348 are the first three numbers in your answer. Then copy the last two digits of your number (45 in this example) to the end.

**ANSWER 101 X 345 = 34845.**

Watch the math video below for a detailed explanation!

### Practice Math Problems

- What does 101 x 54 = ?
- What does 101 x 64 = ?
- What does 101 x 13 = ?
- What does 101 x 88 = ?
- What does 101 x 99 = ?
- What does 101 x 25 = ?
- What does 101 x 253 = ?
- What does 101 x 685 = ?
- What does 101 x 745 = ?
- What does 101 x 660 = ?