# Multiply by 25

Multiplying by 25 is one of the most common problems that you will encounter.

Look at the math problem 25 x 684 = ? Let's see how the trick works.

- Divide the number by 4.
- 684 / 4 = 171 with a remainder of 0. Write 171.

- If you have a remainder of 0 then add 00 at the end.
- If you have a remainder of 1 then add 25 at the end.
- If you have a remainder of 2 then add 50 at the end.
- If you have a remainder of 3 then add 75 at the end.
- Since we had a remainder of 0 at the end we are going to add 00 to our answer. Write 00.

**ANSWER is 17100.**

Watch the math video below for a detailed explanation!

### Practice Math Problems

- What does 25 x 36 = ?
- What does 25 x 55 = ?
- What does 25 x 25 = ?
- What does 25 x 98 = ?
- What does 25 x 2685 = ?
- What does 25 x 567 = ?
- What does 25 x 854 = ?
- What does 25 x 875 = ?
- What does 25 x 432 = ?
- What does 25 x 98456 = ?