# Multiply by 12-19

Mulitplying by teen numbers are extremely common so it's important to know this trick which makes things much easier.

Look at the math problem 12 x 47 = ?

- Multiply the one's digits.
- 2 * 7 = 14
- Write 4 and carry the 1.

- Multiply the one's digit of the teen (2) by the remaining number (4)
- 2 * 4 = 8
- Add this to the other number.
- 8 + 47 = 55.
- Add the 1 that you carried. 55 + 1 = 56.
- Write 56.

**ANSWER is 564.**

Look at the math problem 14 x 263 = ?

- Multiply the one's digits.
- 4 * 3 = 12
- Write 2 and carry the 1.

- Multiply the one's digit of the teen (4) by the remaining numbers (26)
- 4 * 26 = 104
- Add this to the other number.
- 104 + 263 = 367.
- Add the 1 that you carried. 367 + 1 = 368.
- Write 368.

**ANSWER is 3682.**

Watch the math video below for a detailed explanation!

### Practice Math Problems

- What does 12 x 36 = ?
- What does 17 x 94 = ?
- What does 13 x 134 = ?
- What does 14 x 234 = ?
- What does 18 x 31 = ?
- What does 15 x 44 = ?