# FOIL Method - Multiplication Trick

The FOIL (**F**irst, **O**utside, **I**nside, **L**ast) multiplication method is the most important trick that anyone can learn. It allows you to multiply any two digits numbers together very quickly. There are other tricks that are slightly better in specific instances but if you learn the FOIL method you will be all set. .

Look at the math problem 46 x 27 = ?

- Multiply one's digits. .
- 6 x 7 = 42
- Write 2 and carry the 4.

- Multiply the one's digit of each number by the ten's digit of the other.
- 6 x 2 = 12
- 4 x 7 = 28

- Add these together.
- 12 + 28 = 40

- Add the 4 you carried.
- 40 + 4 = 44.
- Write 4 and carry the 4.

- Multiply the ten's digits.
- 4 * 2 = 8.

- Add the 4 you carried.
- 4 + 8 = 12.
- Write 12.

**ANSWER is 1242.**

Look at the math problem 53 x 71 = ?

- Multiply one's digits. .
- 3 x 1 = 3
- Write 3.

- Multiply the one's digit of each number by the ten's digit of the other.
- 3 x 7 = 21
- 5 x 1 = 5

- Add these together.
- 21 + 5 = 26

- Write 6 and carry the 2.
- Multiply the ten's digits.
- 5 * 7 = 35.
- Add the 2 you carried. 35 + 2 = 37.

- Write 37.

**ANSWER is 3763.**

Watch the math video below for a detailed explanation!

### Practice Math Problems

- What does 33 x 84 = ?
- What does 12 x 55 = ?
- What does 43 x 16 = ?
- What does 28 x 16 = ?
- What does 91 x 85 = ?
- What does 42 x 31 = ?
- What does 56 x 24 = ?